+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/31/2021 8:54 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/7/2021 9:06 AM)