+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2014.
- Chapter 176, 2013 Laws.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Davis, Freeman; Excused, 2--Gilliam, Johnson.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Monroe, Shields.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor