+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2016.
- Chapter 234, 2015 Laws.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 29--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Lininger, Lively, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson, Witt.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2015 Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2015 Calendar.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2015 Calendar.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #
3/19/2015 2:16:34 PM
Amendment #4605
3/19/2015 2:16:34 PM
Amendment #4616
3/19/2015 2:16:34 PM
Amendment #4588
3/19/2015 10:08:35 AM
Amendment #4545
3/17/2015 4:07:57 PM
Amendment #4326
3/10/2015 9:30:25 AM