+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -A4
Recommended (6/27/2017 7:35:43 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/17/2015 7:57:56 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/17/2015 2:57:52 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/24/2017 3:57:11 PM)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor