+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #
4/14/2015 10:23:29 AM
Amendment #5573
4/14/2015 10:23:29 AM
Amendment #5572
4/14/2015 10:23:29 AM
Amendment #4458
3/15/2015 11:25:31 PM
Amendment #4447
3/13/2015 2:11:21 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor