+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 324, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Meek, Mitchell, Salinas, Sanchez; Absent, 1--Nosse; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Knopp, Steiner Hayward, Winters.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/4/2019 6:44 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/8/2019 11:13 AM)
Amendment 1
Proposed (4/4/2019 6:44 PM)
Amendment 2
Proposed (4/8/2019 11:13 AM)