+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 491, 2015 Laws.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 42; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Post, Smith, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Barton.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2015 Calendar.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2015 Calendar.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Johnson; excused, 2--Whitsett, Winters.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #5180
4/7/2015 8:55:45 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor