+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 233, 2015 Laws.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2015 Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2015 Calendar.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2015 Calendar.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3823
2/4/2015 2:05:43 PM
Amendment #3793
2/2/2015 5:06:06 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor