+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 245, 2019 Laws.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Gorsek, Helm, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wilde.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/1/2019 9:54 AM)