+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 393, 2021 Laws.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Moore-Green, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from 04-22 Calendar and placed on 04-28 Calendar on voice vote.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/2/2021 9:37 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/24/2021 1:15 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/7/2021 9:52 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/7/2021 9:52 AM)