+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Informational Meeting held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -3
Proposed (3/12/2021 8:59 AM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (3/12/2021 3:11 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/3/2021 2:30 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/3/2021 2:19 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (3/12/2021 8:59 AM)