+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 271, 2015 Laws.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hack. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Read; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2015 Calendar.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2015 Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2015 Calendar.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Edwards.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor