+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2014.
- Chapter 337, 2013 Laws.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Gilliam.
- Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Bentz, Berger, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McKeown, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant; Excused, 3--Barnhart, Gelser, Whitsett.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan, Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Close, Girod, Hansell, Hass, Johnson, Kruse, Monroe, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from 04-17 Calendar and placed on 04-18 Calendar on voice vote.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Judiciary by order of the President.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor