+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 169, 2015 Laws.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Post, Smith, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Sprenger.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2015 Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2015 Calendar.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2015 Calendar.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 12, 2015 Calendar.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2015 Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2015 Calendar.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #4381
3/11/2015 4:06:42 PM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor