+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 10, 2015.
- Chapter 344, 2015 Laws.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barton, Gallegos, Heard, Piluso.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2015 Calendar.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3992
2/19/2015 8:48:16 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor