+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2017.
- Chapter 226, 2017 Laws.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Evans, Rayfield; Excused, 1--Heard.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Johnson, Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/13/2017 12:58:51 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor