+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 16, 2015.
- Chapter 449, 2015 Laws.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed.Ayes, 51; Excused, 4--Buehler, Gorsek, Hack, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Bentz, Buckley, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2015 Calendar.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2015 Calendar.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #
4/17/2015 9:38:12 AM
Amendment #5979
4/17/2015 9:38:12 AM
Amendment #5525
4/14/2015 8:09:23 AM
Amendment #5794
4/14/2015 8:09:23 AM
Amendment #4644
3/20/2015 5:10:20 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor