+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 13, 2019.
- Chapter 357, 2019 Laws.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Thomsen.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.