+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 16, 2015.
- Chapter 448, 2015 Laws.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 4--Evans, Hayden, Post, Weidner; Excused, 4--Buehler, Gorsek, Hack, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Bentz, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Johnson, granted unanimous consent to declare potential conflict of interest after the vote.
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation, then Finance and Revenue.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor