+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 11, 2019.
- Chapter 321, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Findley, Post, Smith G; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Reschke.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--President Courtney.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/4/2019 1:03 PM)