+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 472, 2021 Laws.
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan.
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2021 Calendar.
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Girod, Hansell, Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kennemer.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/23/2021 10:20 PM)