+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Tax Credits by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill and be referred to Committee on Tax Credits. (Printed B-Eng.) Referred to Committee on Tax Credits by Order of the President.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development, then Finance and Revenue.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor