+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, August 12, 2015.
- Chapter 836, 2015 Laws.
On August 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Parrish. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Greenlick.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 1, 2015 Calendar.
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Rules.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood, then Judiciary.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.