+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 27, 2015.
- Chapter 778, 2015 Laws.
On July 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 29--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLain, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Piluso, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Vega Pederson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 3--Boquist, Burdick, Olsen.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor