+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 15, 2019.
- Chapter 545, 2019 Laws.
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 29, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 12--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Lewis, Nearman, Reschke, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 1--Thomsen.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (5/31/2019 2:10 PM)