+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 517, 2017 Laws.
- Effective date, October 6, 2017.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 8--Buehler, Hayden, Heard, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Kennemer, Speaker Kotek.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2017 Calendar.
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Gelser declared potential conflict of interest by unanimous consent.
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment - 1
Adopted (4/19/2017 11:58:52 AM)