+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2014.
- Chapter 169, 2013 Laws.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Thompson. Passed.Ayes, 45; Nays, 13--Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Krieger, McLane, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 2--Read, Whitsett.
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2013 Calendar.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2013 Calendar.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2013 Calendar.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2013 Calendar.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2013 Calendar.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Boquist, George, Olsen, Whitsett.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #4
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor