+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 642, 2017 Laws.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 6--Ferrioli, Hass, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen.
- Hass granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A2
Adopted (6/29/2017 10:30:11 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/10/2017 12:24:38 PM)