+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education by Order of the President, with a subsequent referral to Tax Expenditures.
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Without Recommendation, rescind subsequent referral to Tax Expenditures and return to President's desk for referral.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Tax Expenditures.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.