+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 478, 2021 Laws.
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Bynum, Dexter, Reynolds.
- Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 26--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Cate, Dexter, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Lively, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Reynolds, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 33--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Findley, Heard, Kennemer.
- Motion to refer to Committee on Ways and Means failed. Ayes, 9; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 3--Findley, Heard, Kennemer.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 9; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 3--Findley, Heard, Kennemer.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority) (Not concurring: Linthicum, Thatcher)
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (8)
Amendment -A7
Proposed (6/3/2021 11:51 AM)
Amendment -A9
Proposed (6/2/2021 2:05 PM)
Amendment -AMR 11
Proposed (6/7/2021 3:21 PM)
Amendment -A10
Proposed (6/2/2021 2:06 PM)
Amendment -MR5
Proposed (4/15/2021 4:09 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/8/2021 12:48 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/8/2021 12:49 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/2/2021 2:02 PM)