+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective Date, September 29, 2019.
- Chapter 365, 2019 Laws.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Barker.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -5
Adopted (4/8/2019 9:59 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (3/26/2019 1:58 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (3/26/2019 1:59 PM)