+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, May 23, 2013.
- Chapter 229, 2013 Laws.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hicks. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Thatcher; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Fagan.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 1--Shields.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #1154
Adopted
Amendment #914
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor