+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, April 11, 2013.
- Chapter 37, 2013 Laws.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Cameron. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hoyle.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2013 Calendar.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor