+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 323, 2021 Laws.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 2--Morgan, Wilde; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Girod; Excused, 2--Heard, Thomsen.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.