+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services by order of the President.
- Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred back to Presidents desk for referral. Referred to Health Care and Human Services by order of the President and then Ways and Means by prior reference. Referred to Health Care and Human Services by order of the President.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1690
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor