+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 75, 2021 Laws.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 8--Bynum, Leif, Moore-Green, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 8--Dexter, Drazan, Evans, Lively, Nearman, Ruiz, Stark, Valderrama.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Girod, Heard.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/25/2021 4:47 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/2/2021 5:30 PM)