+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date, September 25, 2020.
- Chapter 17, 2020 Laws.
On July 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Beyer, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Boles, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Leif, Moore-Green, Smith DB, Sollman.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.