+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter 15, 2020 Laws.
- Effective date, July 7, 2020.
On July 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (6/24/2020 9:43 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (6/24/2020 2:25 PM)