+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Greenlick, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 3--Burdick, Shields, Whitsett; excused, 3--Boquist, Hansell, Winters.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment 1
Proposed (2/22/2016 5:40:07 PM)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor