+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Bentz, Komp.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to refer to committee on Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward; excused, 1--Winters.
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 1--Winters.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor