+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/24/2020 11:31 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/27/2020 9:00 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/19/2020 1:42 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/24/2020 11:31 AM)