+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2015.
- Chapter 25, 2014 Laws.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Komp, Thatcher, Tomei.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3209
2/10/2014 10:53:34 AM
Amendment #3401
2/12/2014 4:36:50 PM