+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and requesting referral to Rules and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (14)
Amendment -12
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:47 PM)
Amendment -13
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:47 PM)
Amendment -19
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:47 PM)
Amendment -17
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -18
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -11
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:47 PM)
Amendment -9
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -15
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -16
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -10
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -14
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)
Amendment -20
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:43 PM)