+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2015.
- Chapter 23, 2014 Laws.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Komp, Thatcher.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Close. Passed.Ayes, 30.
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3426
2/13/2014 10:52:07 AM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor