+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -5
Adopted (2/11/2020 1:51 PM)
Amendment -A6
Adopted (2/27/2020 8:58 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/7/2020 10:22 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/10/2020 3:41 PM)