+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 29, 2016.
- Chapter 089, 2016 Laws.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Hansell, Winters.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/8/2016 6:06:23 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/8/2016 10:11:22 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (2/9/2016 4:51:20 PM)
Amendment -A6
Adopted (2/23/2016 1:44:33 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/1/2016 5:52:28 PM)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor