+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 30.
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #3285
2/11/2014 10:36:38 AM
Amendment #3286
2/11/2014 10:36:55 AM
Amendment #3178
2/10/2014 9:00:15 AM
Amendment #3177
2/10/2014 8:59:44 AM