+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 5--Girod, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Whitsett; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Bates, Edwards, Winters.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor