+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Bates, Ferrioli, Shields, Winters.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment 1
Proposed (2/9/2016 7:26:21 PM)
Amendment -1
Combined (2/11/2016 5:10:40 PM)
Amendment 2
Proposed (2/9/2016 7:28:20 PM)
Amendment -3
Combined (2/15/2016 12:27:12 PM)