+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (2/26/2020 6:54 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/6/2020 4:43 PM)